THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:25:57 PM
Samdup, Dawa Zangmo
CPSO#:
80560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Nepali
Education: University of Madras, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
KidsInclusive
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3324
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAWA ZANGMO SAMDUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMDUP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2009 |