THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:13:01 AM
Khan, Anees Ayub
CPSO#:
80559
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Urdu
Education: Bangalore University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1340 El Paseo Court
Greely ON K4P 0C4
Phone: (613) 618-0601
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Aug 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANEES AYUB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 22 Mar 2004 to 28 May 2004
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 29 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jul 2008
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2011 |