THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:10:57 PM
Zhang, Yujie Jackie
CPSO#:
80558
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 889-0062
Fax: (905) 889-9685
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Mar 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YUJIE JACKIE ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Mar 2004 to 11 Jun 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jun 2004 to 28 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Mar 2005 to 28 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2006 |