THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:40:32 PM
Safakish, Ramin
CPSO#:
80554
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
20 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Jun-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Safakish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 23 Mar 2004 to 02 Jun 2004
AVP - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 03 Jun 2004 to 14 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 15 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 24 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 20 Jun 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ramin Safakish to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 1, 2020:
Dr. Safakish will not perform epidural adhesiolysis.