THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:54:31 PM
Feberova, Jana
CPSO#:
80550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Charles Univ Prague, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Division of Neonatology
Dept of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:19 Apr 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 May 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
|
Active |