THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:28:48 AM
Mizrahi, Romina
CPSO#:
80544
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Romina Mizrahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Argentina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2004 to 31 May 2004
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2020 |