THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:20:30 AM
Grouhi, Shahpar
CPSO#:
80543
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tabriz University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHPAR GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2015 |