THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:48:38 AM
Al Houqani, Mohammed Sulaiman Ahmed Saeed
CPSO#:
80538
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: United Arab Emirates University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O.Box 17666
Internal Medicine Department
College of Medicine
Al-Ain 17666
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97137137666
Fax: +97137672995
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:28 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED SULAIMAN AHMED SAEED AL HOUQANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HOUQANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2004 to 16 May 2004
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2008 |