THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:25:48 AM
Blom, Phillip Patrick
CPSO#:
80537
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Phillip Blom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |