THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 21:36:36 PM
Robertson, Deborah Grace
CPSO#:
80529
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
61 Queen St E
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-7480
Fax: 416-867-7478
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH GRACE ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2004 to 04 Apr 2004
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2005 |