THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:59:14 PM
Krishnan, Usha
CPSO#:
80520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. USHA KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 02 May 2004
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2007 |