THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:34:06 PM
Kurian, Susan Saina
CPSO#:
80515
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN SAINA KURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2004 to 23 May 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2005 |