THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 16:05:26 PM
Peregoudov, Serguei
CPSO#:
80507
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 4377797454
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 11, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 7, 2022, Bluewater Health notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991), that Bluewater Health had suspended Dr. Serguei Peregoudov’s hospital privileges effective November 1, 2021 and then revoked/terminated his privileges effective December 21, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SERGUEI PEREGOUDOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREGOUDOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
EL - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2004 |