THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:50:06 AM
Udell, Jacob Allan
CPSO#:
80505
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACOB ALLAN UDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 31 Mar 2004
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Apr 2006
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 28 Feb 2007
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |