THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:12:16 AM
Beshay, Hany Youssef Tawfeek
CPSO#:
80491
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON L5V 0A5
Phone: (905) 858-3030
Fax: (905) 858-3031
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Yukon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANY YOUSSEF TAWFEEK BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2004 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2009
Summary:
On July 14, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beshay committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Beshay received his medical degree in Egypt in 1986, and thereafter practised medicine in Egypt until 1996, at which time he moved to Ontario. Between November 1996 and June 2001, Dr. Beshay did not practise medicine, except for one period in 1998 when he maintains he practised in Egypt. In 2001, Dr. Beshay obtained a licence to practise medicine in the Yukon. In 2004, Dr. Beshay was granted a certificate of registration from the CPSO. Dr. Beshay admitted that the information he supplied to the CPSO and the Yukon Medical Council was in error, in that it failed to disclose interruptions in practice after he came to Canada in 1996.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Beshay appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Beshay pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.
3. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2009