THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:47:26 PM
Rajguru, Manjulata
CPSO#:
80470
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Bhopal University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 624-1551
Fax: (519) 624-1581
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:29 Nov 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANJULATA RAJGURU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJGURU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2005 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Mar 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |