THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:43:03 AM
Arango Arango, Miguel Fernando
CPSO#:
80461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L H S C - University Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2004 to 10 Mar 2004
PEAP - CF - Neuroanaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Mar 2004 to 29 Jan 2005
CF - Neuroanaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neuroanaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
CF - Neuroanaesthesia
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
|
Active |