THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:08:11 AM
Jovanovic, Radmila
CPSO#:
80459
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Byward Family Health Team
Departmant of Paediatrics
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Ext. 450
Fax: 613 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Aug 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 28 Feb 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 May 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
|
Active |