THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:59:55 PM
Kadar, Paul Lewis
CPSO#:
80455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Leaside
Suite 201, 25 Industrial Street
Toronto ON M4G 1Z2
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL LEWIS KADAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2004 to 09 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2005 |