THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:57:49 PM
McLoone, Mary Bridget Elsie
CPSO#:
80450
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-5854
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY BRIDGET ELSIE MCLOONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLOONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2004 to 09 Apr 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |