THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:27:36 AM
Venkat Raghavan, Lakshmikumar
CPSO#:
80445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAKSHMIKUMAR VENKAT RAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKAT RAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 19 Mar 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |