THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:08:55 AM
Anderson, William Daniel
CPSO#:
80440
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospita
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: William D. Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:25 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DANIEL ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2004 |