THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:04:14 PM
Johnstone, Jennie
CPSO#:
80436
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
210-600 University Avenue
Toronto, ON
M5G 1X5
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 2014
Fax: 416-586-8358
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIE JOHNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 26 Jan 2004 to 22 Feb 2004
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
EL - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2008 |