THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:33:46 PM
Robaey, Philippe
CPSO#:
80426
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
21 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Brussels, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 738-6990 Ext. 241
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Mar 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Jan 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE ROBAEY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. ROBAEY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. ROBAEY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ROBAEY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. ROBAEY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. ROBAEY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2004 |