THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:51:31 PM
Alarab, May
CPSO#:
80405
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynaecology
Suite 8-816
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-8428
Fax: (416) 586-8387
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alarab Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:08 May 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 12 Mar 2004
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
|
Active |