THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:09:43 PM
Saad, Samy Mikhail Soliman
CPSO#:
80383
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 1700
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMY MIKHAIL SOLIMAN SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2006 |