THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:48:29 AM
El Demellawy, Dina Mohamed Salah
CPSO#:
80381
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Pathology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3846
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DINA MOHAMED SALAH EL DEMELLAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL DEMELLAWY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |