THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:46:55 AM
El-Brakey, Mary Refaat Ramzy
CPSO#:
80380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2242
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY REFAAT RAMZY EL-BRAKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BRAKEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2008 |