THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:08:32 AM
Wong, Derek Ti Hsin
CPSO#:
80375
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Room 3317
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2390
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEREK TI HSIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2004 to 09 Feb 2004
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2008 |