THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:07:56 AM
Bansal, Atul
CPSO#:
80374
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1800 Stn Main
381 Church Street
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATUL BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jan 2004
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 31 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2005 |