THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:00:58 PM
Bozorgzadeh, Minoo
CPSO#:
80371
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dixie X Ray Associate
8333 Weston Rd. Columbus Medical Bl
Suite #B1
Vaughan ON L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-7478
Fax: (905) 850-6934
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MINOO BOZORGZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZORGZADEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2008 |