THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:50:40 PM
Hussain, Kamal Sharif
CPSO#:
80365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,
Bayview Campus
Dept. of Anesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kamal Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:28 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 12 Feb 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 10 Feb 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 10 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |