THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:40:30 PM
Pillai, Geetha
CPSO#:
80357
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J8
Phone: 5198225350
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Feb 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEETHA PILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILLAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Aug 2023
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |