THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:06:20 PM
Hoosen, Naushad
CPSO#:
80356
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St Catharines ON L2S 4A2
Phone: (905) 682-3692
Fax: (905) 682-7549
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAUSHAD HOOSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2004 |