THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:45:26 PM
Rouzbahman, Marjan
CPSO#:
80350
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
Room 11E 215 11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4564
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARJAN ROUZBAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUZBAHMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2008 |