THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:10:28 AM
Fakhkharian, Faranak
CPSO#:
80344
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Isfahan University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
Suite 14 702
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4773
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARANAK FAKHKHARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAKHKHARIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Dec 2003 to 01 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2004 to 17 Dec 2004
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2010 |