THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 12:41:06 PM
Siddiqui, Mughina Anjum
CPSO#:
80342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax and Pickering Hospital
Anesthesiology
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 705 928 6746
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUGHINA ANJUM SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 25 Mar 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Mar 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2015 |