THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:45:26 AM
Tambasco, Domenica
CPSO#:
80340
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Apr 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Naples, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Environmental Health Clinic
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOMENICA TAMBASCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMBASCO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 16 Jan 2004
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2004 to 01 Feb 2004
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2004 to 13 Feb 2004
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2005 |