THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:11:26 PM
Seyed Akhavan, Pooneh
CPSO#:
80322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
218-701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2K 2Z3
Phone: 416 222 6625
Fax: 416 222 6619
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:15 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. POONEH SEYED AKHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYED AKHAVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2006 |