THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:04:59 AM
Efala, Khal Mabru
CPSO#:
80319
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
ElFallah, Khaled El-Mabruk Ali (used until: 29 Apr 2008 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
G1-145 Front Street East
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 364-4052
Fax: (416) 364-4423
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Khal Efala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2023
Corporation Name: Efala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Corporation Name: Subhra Mohapatra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHAL MABRU EFALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EFALA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 19 Dec 2003
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 20 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 21 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2004 to 21 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2005 to 21 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2006 to 21 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |