THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 9:30:07 AM
Gwiazda, Katarzyna Magdalena
CPSO#:
80301
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital Site
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7557
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATARZYNA MAGDALENA GWIAZDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWIAZDA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2003 to 05 Dec 2003
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
McMaster University, 06 Dec 2003 to 09 Jan 2004
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2009 |