THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:02:19 AM
Razian, Ali
CPSO#:
80281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI RAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2004 |