THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:26:48 PM
Nawrocka, Joanna
CPSO#:
80261
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joanna Nawrocka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2003 to 07 Nov 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2004 to 09 Oct 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Nov 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |