THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 13:12:34 PM
Mohsin, Afshan
CPSO#:
80260
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
59 Third St
Orangeville ON L9W 2B3
Phone: 519-941-1774
Fax: 519-941-5481
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AFSHAN MOHSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHSIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2008 |