THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 20:53:13 PM
Tang-Wai, David France
CPSO#:
80259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street 5WW-441
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5181
Fax: (416) 603-5768
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:18 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID FRANCE TANG-WAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG-WAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |