THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:05:14 AM
Ramadan, Said Abdel Rahman Said
CPSO#:
80246
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON N6H 0J1
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAID ABDEL RAHMAN SAID RAMADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMADAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2003 to 01 Apr 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2009 |