THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:20:51 AM
Gallow, Mark Douglas
CPSO#:
80239
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Sep 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mark Gallow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 May 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |