THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:33:49 PM
Niakosari, Firouzeh
CPSO#:
80238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3-139 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2N 3A6
Phone: 416-222-7546
Fax: 416-221-7546
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:31 Aug 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FIROUZEH NIAKOSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAKOSARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 24 Dec 2003
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Sep 2004
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 18 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Dec 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |