THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:39:16 AM
Antolinez Uribe, Edgar
CPSO#:
80231
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National University of Colombia, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
748 Dundas St
Woodstock ON N4S 1E9
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E. Antolinez Uribe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDGAR ANTOLINEZ URIBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTOLINEZ URIBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2009 |