THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:04:21 AM
Visbal Amador, Fernando Antonio
CPSO#:
80230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
390 Lincoln St
Welland ON L3B 4N4
Phone: 9057881777 Ext. 9057881915
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Visbal Amador & Gonzalez Porras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should contact Safestor Records Management to request a copy of their medical records
Safestor Records Management
2704 RR 20
Fonthill ON L0S 1E6
Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 05 Sep 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FERNANDO ANTONIO VISBAL AMADOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISBAL AMADOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2008 |